EP4295798 - GRAPHICAL CONTACT QUALITY INDICATOR FOR BALLOON CATHETER NAVIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOSENSE WEBSTER (ISRAEL) LTD. 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHA, Qun Irvine, 92618 / US | 02 /
ROSENBERG, Avigdor 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 03 /
ADAWI, Eid 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 04 /
SHARMA, Tushar Irvine, 92618 / US | 05 /
ABDELAAL, Ahmed Irvine, 92618 / US | 06 /
ZHANG, Xiangming Irvine, 92618 / US | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 23180860.1 | 22.06.2023 | [2023/52] | Priority number, date | US202217848158 | 23.06.2022 Original published format: US202217848158 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4295798 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61B18/12 (CN);
A61B34/20 (CN);
A61B34/25 (IL,US);
A61B5/0538 (IL,US);
A61B5/287 (IL,US);
A61B5/7435 (IL,US);
A61B90/06 (CN);
A61B2018/0022 (CN,IL,US);
A61B2018/00351 (CN);
A61B2018/00375 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00595 (CN);
A61B2018/00613 (CN);
A61B2018/00797 (EP);
A61B2018/00875 (EP);
A61B2018/00898 (EP);
A61B2018/1253 (CN);
A61B2018/126 (CN);
A61B2018/1467 (CN);
A61B2034/2051 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/31] |
Former [2023/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRAFISCHER KONTAKTQUALITÄTSINDIKATOR FÜR BALLONKATHETERNAVIGATION | [2023/52] | English: | GRAPHICAL CONTACT QUALITY INDICATOR FOR BALLOON CATHETER NAVIGATION | [2023/52] | French: | INDICATEUR DE QUALITÉ DE CONTACT GRAPHIQUE POUR NAVIGATION DE CATHÉTER À BALLONNET | [2023/52] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/31] | 26.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017202614 (GROSS YOSSI [IL], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0149] , [0151]; figures 7a,7b *; | [A]WO2020072749 (EPIX THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 10,13 * page 348, lines 2-5 ** page 348, line 15 - page 349, line 8 *; | [Y]US2020229866 (HARLEV DORON [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0110] , [0112] , [0113] , [0119] - [0121] - [0122] , [0129]; figures 9,10 * | by applicant | US6625482 | US8456182 | US2021089569 | US11006902 |