EP4269616 - ACCURATE MOLECULAR BARCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 15.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUM, Eleen Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
FU, Glenn Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 23181147.2 | 28.04.2017 | [2023/44] | Priority number, date | US201662330500P | 02.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662330500 P | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4269616 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4269616 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6869 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (US);
C12Q1/6806 (US);
C12Q1/6874 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2563/179 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2565/514 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/38] |
Former [2023/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GENAUE MOLEKULARE BARCODIERUNG | [2023/44] | English: | ACCURATE MOLECULAR BARCODING | [2023/44] | French: | CODES À BARRES MOLÉCULAIRES PRÉCIS | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/38] | 14.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17735675.5 / EP3452614 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02059355 (TM BIOSCIENCE CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * pages 30-31 * * pages 39-41, * * pages 47-48 *; | [A]US2010159533 (LIPSON DORON [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0016] *; | [A]WO2014145992 (ADAPTIVE BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 *; | [XAI]WO2015031691 (CELLULAR RES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10-12 * paragraphs [0335] , [0754]; figures 1,2A67-68; example 1 * [A] 9 [I] 3-5,8,13,14; | [I]WO2015134787 (ADAPTIVE BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0233]; claim 1 *; | [AP]WO2016138500 (CELLULAR RES INC [US]) [AP] 1-14 * figure 1; claims 1,4 *; | [E]WO2018094263 (TWIST BIOSCIENCE CORP [US]) [E] 1* paragraph [0124] *; | [I] - TILO BUSCHMANN ET AL, "Enhancing the detection of barcoded reads in high throughput DNA sequencing data by controlling the false discovery rate", BMC BIOINFORMATICS, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20140807), vol. 15, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1471-2105-15-264, ISSN 1471-2105, page 264, XP021191527 [I] 1-14 * page 3, column r, paragraph l - page 4, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2105-15-264 | [ ] - Thilo Buschmann ET AL, "Additional file 2", BMC Bioinofromatics, (20140807), page 264, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC4133078/bin/12859_2013_6528_MOESM2_ESM.pdf, (20170825), XP055401307 | [A] - TEEMU KIVIOJA ET AL, "Counting absolute numbers of molecules using unique molecular identifiers", NATURE METHODS, (20111120), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1038/nmeth.1778, ISSN 1548-7091, pages 72 - 74, XP055401382 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.1778 | by applicant | - FU et al., PNAS, (20110000), vol. 108, pages 9026 - 9032 |