Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
20.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
20.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
24.06.2023 | Change - representative |