EP4253763 - DAMPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 25.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOLY, Philippe, Gérard, Edmond 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
COMIN, François, Jean 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
DOUGUET, Charles, Jean-Pierre 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 04 /
JABLONSKI, Laurent 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 05 /
LAGARDE, Romain, Nicolas 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 06 /
PERROLLAZ, Jean-Marc, Claude 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23181825.3 | 14.12.2018 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | FR20170062170 | 14.12.2017 Original published format: FR 1762170 | [2023/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4253763 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4253763 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/22, F01D5/26, F01D5/10, F04D29/32, F04D29/66 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
F04D29/668 (EP);
F01D5/22 (EP,US);
F01D5/10 (EP,US);
F01D5/26 (EP,US);
F04D29/322 (EP,US);
F05D2220/36 (EP,US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US);
F05D2240/80 (US);
F05D2260/96 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | F04D29/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | DÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/40] | English: | DAMPING DEVICE | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF AMORTISSEUR | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 25.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18836279.2 / EP3724455 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4723889 (CHARRERON DENIS C [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 24 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 10 ** figures 1, 6 *; | [Y]EP1985810 (SNECMA [FR]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0027] * * figure 8 *; | [Y]FR2923557 (SNECMA SA [FR]) [Y] 4-13 * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XAYI]FR2988427 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1,3,14 * page 8, line 6 - line 18 * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 22 * * figures 5, 6 * [A] 7 [Y] 4-6,8-13,15 [I] 2; | [XAYI]CN204941612U (AVIC SHENYANG ENGINE DESIGN & RES INST) [X] 1,14 * figures 1, 2 * [A] 3-5 [Y] 6-13,15 [I] 2 | by applicant | EP1985810 | FR2923557 | FR2949142 |