EP4362052 - AN EARTHING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB SCHWEIZ AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHANDARI, Sachin 422009 Nashik / IN | 02 /
KULKARNI, Bhushan 422005 Nashik / IN | 03 /
PARDESHI, Sagar 422006 Nashik / IN | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23181957.4 | 28.06.2023 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | IN202241041261 | 19.07.2022 Original published format: IN202241041261 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4362052 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01H31/00, H02B13/075 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
H01H31/003 (EP);
H01R13/652 (CN);
H02B11/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERDUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2024/18] | English: | AN EARTHING MECHANISM | [2024/18] | French: | MÉCANISME DE MISE À LA TERRE | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN100458997C (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]); | [A]US2012120560 (ZWICKY DANIEL [CH], et al); | [A]US2019052067 (BENSON SETH [US]); | [A]US2021320481 (KIM HYOUNGJIN [KR], et al); | [A]CN113541027 (SHANGHAI WEIZHUANG ELECTRIC GAS CO LTD) |