EP4305986 - AEROSOL DOSE TESTING DEVICE, AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE, AND HEATING CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Smoore Technology Limited 2 Floor Building 8 No. 16 Dongcai Industrial Park Gushu Town Xixiang, Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518102 / CN | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Wei Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518102 / CN | 02 /
XIAO, Feng Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518102 / CN | 03 /
YUAN, Huakai Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518102 / CN | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 23182170.3 | 28.06.2023 | [2024/03] | Priority number, date | CN202210812403 | 12.07.2022 Original published format: CN202210812403 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4305986 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/51, A24F40/53, A61M15/00 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A24F40/51 (EP);
A61M11/00 (CN);
A61M11/042 (EP,US);
A24F40/53 (EP);
A61M15/0001 (CN);
A61M15/0065 (EP,CN);
A61M15/008 (EP);
G01N15/06 (EP);
G01N21/53 (EP);
G01N21/85 (EP);
A61M15/06 (EP);
A61M16/06 (EP);
A61M16/14 (EP);
A61M2016/0021 (EP);
A61M2016/0024 (EP);
A61M2205/276 (EP);
A61M2205/3306 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3382 (US);
A61M2205/368 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
A61M2205/8212 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2024/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AEROSOLDOSISTESTVORRICHTUNG, AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ERWÄRMUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/03] | English: | AEROSOL DOSE TESTING DEVICE, AEROSOL-GENERATING DEVICE, AND HEATING CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2024/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TEST DE DOSE D'AÉROSOL, DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CHAUFFAGE ASSOCIÉ | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 19.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019247596 (FREEMAN DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0010] , [0012] - [0014] - [0037] , [0041] - [0043] - [0051] - [0054] * * figures 1-13 * [I] 3,4; | [XI]US2019335817 (FREEMAN DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1,7-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0036] - [0041] - [0044] - [0054] * * claim 1 * * figures 1-12 * [I] 3,4; | [X]US2020023148 (WEITZEL DOUGLAS [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,11 * paragraphs [0029] - [0045] * * figures 1-13 *; | [XI]JP2020526334 (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,5,7-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0013] , [0016] , [0018] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4; | [X] - Unknown, "Smoke Detector", (20220621), pages 1 - 17, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Smoke_detector&oldid=1094297430, (20231117), XP093102794 [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document * |