EP4277278 - TRANSFORM-BASED IMAGE CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.07.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOO, Moonmo SEOUL 06772 / KR | 02 /
LIM, Jaehyun SEOUL 06772 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Jungah SEOUL 06772 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Seunghwan SEOUL 06772 / KR | 05 /
SALEHIFAR, Mehdi SEOUL 06772 / KR | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 23182212.3 | 12.03.2020 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | US201962817494P | 12.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962817494 P | US201962817490P | 12.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962817490 P | US201962822000P | 21.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962822000 P | US201962823571P | 25.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962823571 P | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4277278 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/60, H04N19/132, H04N19/176, H04N19/12, H04N19/13, H04N19/18, H04N19/625 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP);
H04N19/60 (CN,KR,US);
H04N19/132 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N19/12 (EP);
H04N19/13 (EP);
H04N19/137 (CN,KR);
H04N19/14 (CN,KR);
H04N19/167 (CN,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/46] | H04N19/60, H04N19/132, H04N19/176, H04N19/14, H04N19/137 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSFORMATIONSBASIERTE BILDCODIERUNG | [2023/46] | English: | TRANSFORM-BASED IMAGE CODING | [2023/46] | French: | CODAGE D'IMAGE BASÉ SUR UNE TRANSFORMÉE | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20770672.2 / EP3910956 | Divisional application(s) | EP24186964.3 / EP4418656 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013006446 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [A]EP2779643 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); |