EP4300418 - SYSTEM FOR ASSISTING A USER IN THE IMAGE-BASED RECOGNITION OF TISSUE DEGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eissing-Al-Mukahal, Ali Bandelstraße 26 30171 Hannover / DE | For all designated states Wilkens, Ludwig Anecampstraße 36 30539 Hannover / DE | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23182491.3 | 29.06.2023 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | DE202210116407 | 30.06.2022 Original published format: DE102022116407 | [2024/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4300418 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30024 (EP);
G06T2207/30096 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2024/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES NUTZERS BEI DER BILDBASIERTEN ERKENNUNG EINER GEWEBEENTARTUNG | [2024/01] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ASSISTING A USER IN THE IMAGE-BASED RECOGNITION OF TISSUE DEGENERATION | [2024/01] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE D'UN UTILISATEUR DANS LA DÉTECTION BASÉE SUR L'IMAGE D'UNE DÉGUSTATION TISSULAIRE | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/32] | 03.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018046759 (BARRAL JOËLLE K [US]) [Y] 7 * abstract ** paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] *; | [XAYI]US2022084660 (GEORGESCU WALTER [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0033] , [0040] , [0045] , [0116] , [0120] , [0139] , [0164] , [0200] , [0202] , [0203] , [0208] , [0212] * [A] 11-14 [Y] 7 [I] 2-6 |