EP4304103 - MULTI-LINK DEVICE CAPABLE OF ACTIVELY CHANGING LINK MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Rd. 1st Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu 300 / TW | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Li-Tien 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | 02 /
CHANG, Cheng-Yi 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | 03 /
LIN, Chun-Ting 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 23183102.5 | 03.07.2023 | [2024/02] | Priority number, date | US202263367657P | 05.07.2022 Original published format: US 202263367657 P | US202318216589 | 29.06.2023 Original published format: US202318216589 | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4304103 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, // H04W88/06, H04W84/12, H04W88/10 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
H04B7/04 (EP);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W88/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/32] |
Former [2024/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTILINK-VORRICHTUNG MIT FÄHIGKEIT ZUR AKTIVEN ÄNDERUNG DES VERKNÜPFUNGSMODUS | [2024/02] | English: | MULTI-LINK DEVICE CAPABLE OF ACTIVELY CHANGING LINK MODE | [2024/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF À LIAISONS MULTIPLES CAPABLE DE CHANGER ACTIVEMENT UN MODE DE LIAISON | [2024/02] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/32] | 02.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2021282119 (ASTERJADHI ALFRED [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0100] * * figure 6 * [I] 3-9,12-15; | [I]WO2022032150 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0164] ** figure 13 *; | [XI]US2022116957 (CARIOU LAURENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0113] * * figure 8 * [I] 2-9,11-15 |