EP4240126 - WHITE ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Song, Ki-Woog Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Pieh, Sung Hoon Seoul / KR | 03 /
Kam, Youn Seok Seoul / KR | 04 /
Kim, Tae Shick Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Se Ung Seoul / KR | 06 /
Kim, Hyung June Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 23183144.7 | 30.03.2015 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | KR20140037728 | 31.03.2014 Original published format: KR 20140037728 | KR20140056607 | 12.05.2014 Original published format: KR 20140056607 | KR20140082617 | 02.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140082617 | KR20150030633 | 04.03.2015 Original published format: KR 20150030633 | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4240126 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4240126 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10K50/13, // H10K50/852 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H10K50/131 (EP,US);
H10K50/13 (US);
H10K50/852 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | H10K50/125, // H10K50/852 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | WEISSE ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/36] | English: | WHITE ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE | [2023/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE BLANC | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 25.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15161618.2 / EP2927983 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2007012369 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,10,12,15* paragraphs [0182] - [0185]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2012241794 (SEO SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,12-15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0048] - [0054] - [0057] - [0126] - [0146]; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US2012248971 (OKUYAMA SUGURU [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,12-15 * paragraphs [0055] - [0078] - [0088] - [0093] - [0107] - [0113] - [0145] - [0153]; figures 1,23 * [A] 2,3,6-11 | by applicant | KR20140037728 | KR20140056607 | KR20140082617 | KR20150030633 |