EP4325773 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENTERPRISE-LEVEL SECURITY POLICY MANAGEMENT TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights OH 44124 / US | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Molzon, Dustin A. Mayfield Heights 44124 / US | 02 /
Jasper, Taryl J. Mayfield Heights 44124 / US | 03 /
Mikolajczyk, Roch Mayfield Heights 44124 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 23183301.3 | 04.07.2023 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | US202217889671 | 17.08.2022 Original published format: US202217889671 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4325773 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06F21/60, G05B19/418 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
H04L63/205 (CN);
G05B19/4185 (EP);
G06F21/604 (EP);
H04L63/10 (US);
H04L9/40 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/39] |
Former [2024/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN SICHERHEITSRICHTLINIENVERWALTUNGSWERKZEUG AUF UNTERNEHMENSEBENE | [2024/08] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENTERPRISE-LEVEL SECURITY POLICY MANAGEMENT TOOL | [2024/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR OUTIL DE GESTION DE POLITIQUE DE SÉCURITÉ AU NIVEAU DE L'ENTREPRISE | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/39] | 20.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3001639 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES LTD [IE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0025] ** paragraphs [0042] - [0050] *; | [I]US2018367568 (MARTINEZ RICARDO L [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0033] *; | [X]US2020120143 (NICOLL ALEX L [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0046] * * paragraphs [0056] , [0 59] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0067] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0073] *; | [X]EP3907969 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0057] , [0 68] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0086] * * paragraphs [0110] - [0114] * |