EP4250778 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SECURELY AUTHENTICATING AN ELECTRONIC USER DEVICE TO A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M2MD Technologies, Inc. 525 Chestnut Rose Lane Atlanta, Georgia 30327 / US | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Link II, Charles M. Atlanta GA Georgia, 30327 / US | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 23183412.8 | 06.05.2016 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | US201562165358P | 22.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562165358 P | US201615072087 | 16.03.2016 Original published format: US201615072087 | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4250778 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4250778 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/35, G06F21/43, G06F21/62, H04W4/021, H04W4/40, H04W12/06, B60R25/24, G06F21/34, G06F21/44, G07C9/00, H04W4/80, H04W12/00, H04W12/30 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
G07C9/00182 (US);
B60R25/24 (US);
G06F21/34 (US);
G06F21/35 (US);
G06F21/44 (US);
H04L63/08 (US);
H04L63/0853 (US);
H04L63/123 (US);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W12/35 (EP,US);
H04W4/40 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
B60R2325/205 (US);
G06F2221/2113 (US);
G07C2009/00198 (US);
H04W12/61 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/39] | H04W4/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] |
Former [2023/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SICHEREN AUTHENTISIERUNG EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN BENUTZERGERÄTS GEGEN EIN FAHRZEUG | [2023/39] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SECURELY AUTHENTICATING AN ELECTRONIC USER DEVICE TO A VEHICLE | [2023/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR AUTHENTIFIER DE MANIÈRE SÉCURISÉE UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR ÉLECTRONIQUE ENVERS UN VÉHICULE | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 09.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16800480.2 / EP3298528 | EP20181108.0 / EP3734480 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 30.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 30.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.05.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014096217 (LEHMANN DIRK [DE]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] ** paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0039] *; | [A]US2015109099 (BIRKEL STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019] * |