EP4307228 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUTA, Kyohei Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Satoshi Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Canon Europe Limited European Intellectual Property Group 4 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1AF / GB | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 23183435.9 | 04.07.2023 | [2024/03] | Priority number, date | JP20220112009 | 12.07.2022 Original published format: JP 2022112009 | JP20230073848 | 27.04.2023 Original published format: JP 2023073848 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4307228 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/586 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
G06T7/586 (EP);
G06T5/30 (US);
G06F3/14 (US);
G06T5/70 (US);
G06T7/13 (US);
G06V10/25 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/34] |
Former [2024/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/03] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/03] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/34] | 17.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - CHENG KEVIN H M ET AL, "Revisiting Outlier Rejection Approach for Non-Lambertian Photometric Stereo", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE, USA, vol. 28, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TIP.2018.2875531, ISSN 1057-7149, (20190301), pages 1544 - 1555, (20181119), XP011698180 [X] 1,2,4,9,11,12 * abstract * * sections I-II.B & IV * [A] 3,5-8 [I] 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2018.2875531 | [A] - BARSKY S ET AL, "THE 4-SOURCE PHOTOMETRIC STEREO TECHNIQUE FOR THREE-DIMENSIONAL SURFACES IN THE PRESENCE OF HIGHLIGHTS AND SHADOWS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, (20031001), vol. 25, no. 10, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2003.1233898, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 1239 - 1252, XP001185257 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2003.1233898 | [A] - DONG BO ET AL, "Scattering Parameters and Surface Normals from Homogeneous Translucent Materials Using Photometric Stereo", 2014 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, IEEE, (20140623), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2014.294, pages 2299 - 2306, XP032649109 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2014.294 | [A] - SHI BOXIN ET AL, "A Benchmark Dataset and Evaluation for Non-Lambertian and Uncalibrated Photometric Stereo", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, vol. 41, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2018.2799222, ISSN 0162-8828, (20190201), pages 271 - 284, (20190107), XP011696232 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2018.2799222 | by applicant | JP2012122870 |