EP4325795 - BACKGROUND DISCOVERY AGENT ORCHESTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights OH 44124 / US | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jasper, Taryl J. Mayfield Heights, OH / US | 02 /
Rischar, Charles M. Mayfield Heights, OH / US | 03 /
Bartman, Radek Mayfield Heights, OH / US | 04 /
Vitek, Roman Mayfield Heights, OH / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 23183598.4 | 05.07.2023 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | US202217819671 | 15.08.2022 Original published format: US202217819671 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4325795 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/12, H04L41/0853, G05B19/418, H04L67/51, // G05B19/05, H04L41/046, H04L41/14 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
G05B19/4185 (EP);
G05B19/0428 (US);
H04L41/12 (EP);
G05B19/4186 (EP);
G05B2219/25057 (US);
H04L41/046 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HINTERGRUNDENTDECKUNGS-AGENT-ORCHESTRIERUNG | [2024/08] | English: | BACKGROUND DISCOVERY AGENT ORCHESTRATION | [2024/08] | French: | ORCHESTRATION D'AGENT DE DÉCOUVERTE D'ARRIÈRE-PLAN | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016380841 (CORDRAY CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0146] * * paragraph [0163] - paragraph [0164] ** paragraph [0186] * |