EP4310825 - PIXEL CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Seungchan 871-1004 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
LEE, SEONGJUN 501-409 Songpa-gu, Seoul / KR | 03 /
LEE, WANGJO 2202-303 Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 23185329.2 | 13.07.2023 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | KR20220090636 | 21.07.2022 Original published format: KR 20220090636 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310825 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3233 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3225 (CN,US);
G09G3/3258 (US);
G09G3/30 (CN,US);
G09G3/3266 (KR,US);
G09G3/3275 (KR,US);
G09G3/3291 (US);
G09G2300/0814 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (KR,US);
G09G2300/0866 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0251 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2024/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIXELSCHALTUNG | [2024/04] | English: | PIXEL CIRCUIT | [2024/04] | French: | CIRCUIT DE PIXEL | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 27.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012001896 (HAN SAM-IL [KR], et al); | [Y]US2021193030 (LEE SEYONG [KR], et al); | [Y]US2021264857 (WANG SEONG MIN [KR], et al) |