EP4241888 - BIOLOGICAL FLUID SEPARATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive, Mail Code 110 Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IVOSEVIC, Milan Kinnelon New Jersey, 07405 / US | 02 /
LI, Peng Ridgewood New Jersey, 07450 / US | 03 /
WENTZELL, Scott Caldwell New Jersey, 07006 / US | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 23185334.2 | 07.06.2018 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | US201762516833P | 08.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762516833 P | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4241888 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4241888 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, A61B5/15, A61B5/154, // G01N33/49, B01L3/02 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B01L3/502 (EP,US);
A61B5/15003 (EP);
A61B5/150351 (EP);
A61B5/150732 (EP);
A61B5/15074 (EP);
A61B5/150755 (EP);
A61B5/154 (EP);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0647 (EP);
B01L2200/0668 (US);
B01L2300/042 (US);
B01L2300/044 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0832 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0877 (US);
B01L2300/0883 (US);
B01L2400/049 (EP,US);
B01L3/0296 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | B01L3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRENNEN EINER BIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2023/37] | English: | BIOLOGICAL FLUID SEPARATION DEVICE | [2023/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION DE FLUIDE BIOLOGIQUE | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18734726.5 / EP3634632 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006029923 (TOGAWA KATSUYA [JP], et al); | [XAI]JP2007000536 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]US2008017577 (YI JIZU [US], et al); | [A]JP2008245778 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]CN102764133 (SHANGHAI KEHUA LAB MEDICINE PRODUCT CO LTD); |