EP4279136 - METHODS FOR DETERMINING CAR-T CELLS DOSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2025 Database last updated on 01.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2025 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2025 [2025/08] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juno Therapeutics, Inc. 400 Dexter Ave. N, Suite 1200 Seattle, WA 98109 / US | ||
[2023/47] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, He Seattle, 98109-4703 / US | ||
02 /
ALBERTSON, Tina Seattle, 98109 / US | |||
03 /
HEIPEL, Mark D Seattle, 98109 / US | |||
04 /
SUTHERLAND, Claire L Seattle, 98109 / US | |||
[2023/47] | |||
Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
[2023/47] | |||
Application number, filing date | 23185364.9 | 01.12.2017 | |
[2023/47] | |||
Priority number, date | US201662429738P | 03.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662429738 P | |
US201762514765P | 02.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762514765 P | ||
US201762515523P | 05.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762515523 P | ||
[2023/47] | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | |
No.: | EP4279136 | ||
Date: | 22.11.2023 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2023/47] | |||
Type: | A3 Search report | ||
No.: | EP4279136 | ||
Date: | 20.03.2024 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2024/12] | |||
Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2024 |
Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K39/44, A61K39/00, A61P35/00 | [2024/10] |
CPC: |
A61K39/39558 (EP,KR);
A61K40/32 (KR);
C07K14/7051 (US);
| ||
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | ||
Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | |
ME | Not yet paid | ||
Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | |
MD | Not yet paid | ||
TN | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FESTLEGUNG DER DOSIERUNG VON CAR-T-ZELLEN | [2023/47] |
English: | METHODS FOR DETERMINING CAR-T CELLS DOSING | [2023/47] | |
French: | MÉTHODES POUR DÉTERMINER LE DOSAGE DE CÉLLULES CAR-T | [2023/47] | |
Examination procedure | 21.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2025/08] | |
17.10.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2025/08] | ||
Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17825663.2 / EP3548084 | ||
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | ||
15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012062596 (MICROMET GMBH [DE], et al); | |
[X]WO2014011984 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | |||
[XPY]WO2017165571 (SEATTLE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL (DBA SEATTLE CHILDREN'S RES INSTITUTE) [US]); | |||
by applicant | US8450329 | ||
US8252592 | |||
US4452773 | |||
US4690915 | |||
US4795698 | |||
US4903830 | |||
EP0090505 | |||
US5033252 | |||
US5052558 | |||
US5087616 | |||
US5200084 | |||
US5219740 | |||
US5323907 | |||
EP0452342 | |||
US5424297 | |||
US5504090 | |||
WO9613593 | |||
WO9618105 | |||
US5545627 | |||
US5565566 | |||
US5591827 | |||
US5635517 | |||
US5670501 | |||
US5712291 | |||
US5786360 | |||
US5861405 | |||
WO9918129 | |||
WO9920758 | |||
WO9940196 | |||
US5981524 | |||
WO9960120 | |||
WO0014257 | |||
US6040177 | |||
US6066642 | |||
US6111090 | |||
US6117998 | |||
WO0103720 | |||
US6207453 | |||
US6232297 | |||
WO0150401 | |||
US6313131 | |||
US6322771 | |||
US6326390 | |||
US6410319 | |||
WO02055083 | |||
WO02059106 | |||
WO02068414 | |||
US6451995 | |||
US2002131960 | |||
US2002150914 | |||
US2003045552 | |||
WO03020763 | |||
WO03068201 | |||
US2003170238 | |||
US2003223994 | |||
WO2004033685 | |||
US2004191260 | |||
WO2005007190 | |||
WO2005055808 | |||
WO2005115451 | |||
WO2006000830 | |||
US2006034850 | |||
US7025962 | |||
US7070995 | |||
WO2006083289 | |||
US7091353 | |||
US7141575 | |||
US2007092530 | |||
US2007116690 | |||
US7265209 | |||
WO2007133822 | |||
EP1866339 | |||
US7320991 | |||
US7354762 | |||
US7405219 | |||
US7446190 | |||
US7446179 | |||
US7446191 | |||
WO2008147482 | |||
WO2008154252 | |||
WO2009072003 | |||
US2009226474 | |||
US7618632 | |||
US2009304679 | |||
WO2010003118 | |||
WO2010033140 | |||
US7812135 | |||
US2011003380 | |||
EP2277543 | |||
WO2011028683 | |||
WO2011044186 | |||
WO2011051726 | |||
WO2011056983 | |||
WO2011066048 | |||
WO2011090754 | |||
WO2011109789 | |||
US8080554 | |||
WO2012129514 | |||
US8324353 | |||
US8339645 | |||
EP2537416 | |||
US8388967 | |||
US8389282 | |||
US8398282 | |||
WO2013039954 | |||
WO2013071154 | |||
US2013149337 | |||
US8479118 | |||
EP1947183 | |||
WO2013123061 | |||
WO2013126726 | |||
US2013287748 | |||
WO2013166321 | |||
US8586023 | |||
US8591886 | |||
US2014056922 | |||
WO2014031687 | |||
WO2014055668 | |||
US8716315 | |||
US8716301 | |||
US8802374 | |||
US8822647 | |||
US2014271635 | |||
US2014294841 | |||
US2014322183 | |||
US8883500 | |||
US8911993 | |||
US2014377240 | |||
US8987279 | |||
WO2015079417 | |||
US2015175711 | |||
US9102760 | |||
US2015283178 | |||
US2016068601 | |||
US2016096902 | |||
WO2016069647 | |||
US2016304624 | |||
US9476028 | |||
US2016313300 | |||
US2017051035 | |||
WO1991US08442 | |||
WO1994US05601 |