EP4306428 - LIQUID HYDROGEN PUMP AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4, D04 Y0C2 / IE | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARKAR, Subrata 412207 Pune / IN | 02 /
BORAWAKE, Abhijit Shrikrishna 411037 Pune / IN | 03 /
RILEY, Steven C. Grayshott / GB | 04 /
MASSON, Andrew J. Dublin, D04 Y0C2 / IE | 05 /
PATEL, Sahil K. Southampton SO15 5FR / GB | 06 /
KALMEGH, Amit V. Pune, 411048 / GB | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 23185447.2 | 14.07.2023 | [2024/03] | Priority number, date | IN202211040491 | 14.07.2022 Original published format: IN202211040491 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4306428 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B64D37/06, B64D37/30, F04D7/02, F04D13/08, F04D13/12, F04D13/14, F04D29/58, F04D29/60 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
F04D29/608 (EP);
F04D29/605 (US);
B64D37/06 (EP);
B64D37/30 (EP);
B64D37/34 (EP);
F04D13/06 (US);
F04D13/086 (EP);
F04D13/12 (EP);
F04D13/14 (EP);
F04D29/406 (US);
F04D29/5806 (EP);
F04D29/606 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGWASSERSTOFFPUMPE UND VERFAHREN | [2024/03] | English: | LIQUID HYDROGEN PUMP AND METHODS | [2024/03] | French: | POMPE À HYDROGÈNE LIQUIDE ET PROCÉDÉS | [2024/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 17.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]GB940510 (HOBSON LTD H M) [I] 1-7 * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 94 * * figures 1-3 *[A] 8-15; | [XAI]EP3069004 (EATON LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-9 * [A] 8-15 [I] 3-7 | by applicant | EP20230167974 |