EP4310658 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE SUPPORTING OUT-OF-BAND COMMUNICATION, AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kyungkeun Suwon-si, 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Bumjun Suwon-si, 16677 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Seunghan Suwon-si, 16677 / KR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 23185535.4 | 14.07.2023 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | KR20220090564 | 21.07.2022 Original published format: KR 20220090564 | KR20230000283 | 02.01.2023 Original published format: KR 20230000283 | US202318215599 | 28.06.2023 Original published format: US202318215599 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310658 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F11/30 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G06F3/0623 (EP);
G06F11/3058 (EP);
G06F3/0619 (EP);
G06F3/0634 (EP);
G06F3/0653 (EP);
G06F3/0679 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2024/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON BANDEXTERNER KOMMUNIKATION UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2024/04] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE SUPPORTING OUT-OF-BAND COMMUNICATION, AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SAME | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PRENANT EN CHARGE UNE COMMUNICATION HORS BANDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 22.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2018292992 (KACHARE RAMDAS P [US], et al) [X] 1-8,12,14,15 * figures 3-11 * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0096] * [A] 9-11 [I] 13; | [A]US2020050800 (SCHAUER STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0065] *; | [IA]US2022200968 (HELMICK DANIEL [US], et al) [I] 1 * figures 1-3,7,8 * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0106] * [A] 2-15; | [A] - Anonymous, "NVM Express Base Specification Revision 2.0", (20210513), pages 1 - 400, URL: https://nvmexpress.org/wp-content/uploads/NVM-Express-Base-Specification-2_0-2021.06.02-Ratified-5.pdf, (20230928), XP093086797 [A] 1-15 * page 92 * | [A] - Stenfort Ross ET AL, "NVMe Cloud SSD Specification", (20200318), pages 1 - 72, URL: https://www.opencompute.org/documents/nvme-cloud-ssd-specification-v1-0-3-pdf, (20231204), XP093108684 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |