EP4332007 - DRIVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB SCHWEIZ AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURPHY, Kevin Philadelphia, 19107 / US | 02 /
ZERWECK, Jason Philadelphia, 19107 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23185764.0 | 17.07.2023 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | US202217814227 | 21.07.2022 Original published format: US202217814227 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332007 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/00, B65B13/02, B65B13/18, B65B13/22, B65B13/32 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
B65B13/14 (EP,US);
B65B13/22 (EP,US);
B65B13/025 (US);
B65B13/08 (US);
B65B13/187 (EP,US);
B65B13/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSANORDNUNG | [2024/10] | English: | DRIVE ASSEMBLY | [2024/10] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2024/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2933261 (FALCK-PEDERSEN KJELL A); | [Y]CA2253605 (THOMAS & BETTS INT [US]); | [XYI]US2013276415 (HABERSTROH JAMES A [US], et al); | [Y]CN205819628U (SHENZHEN SHI WEIDE AUTOMATION TECH CO LTD) |