EP4254797 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INHIBITING A SUBSTRATE CURRENT IN AN IC SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elmos Semiconductor SE Heinrich-Hertz-Straße 1 44227 Dortmund / DE | For all designated states Hyundai Mobis Co., Ltd. (Yeoksam-dong) 203, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06141 / KR | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abaza, Fikret 44227 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
Sudhaus, Andre 44227 Dortmund / DE | 03 /
Friemann, Uwe 44227 Dortmund / DE | 04 /
Friesen, Andreas 44227 Dortmund / DE | 05 /
Schmalhorst, Mats 44227 Dortmund / DE | 06 /
Liedtke, Marco 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23185796.2 | 18.03.2021 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | DE202010107479 | 18.03.2020 Original published format: DE102020107479 | [2023/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4254797 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4254797 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02, H02H9/04, H03K17/16, H01L23/60, G01R31/26 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
H01L27/0251 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/2853 (KR);
H01L29/12 (US);
B60R21/01 (KR,US);
G01R31/2607 (KR);
G01R31/2648 (EP,KR);
G01R31/52 (KR);
G01R31/56 (KR);
H01L21/8249 (KR,US);
H03K17/162 (EP,KR);
B60R2021/01211 (KR,US);
B60R2021/01272 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | H03K17/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] |
Former [2023/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG EINES SUBSTRATSTROMS IN EINEM IC-HALBLEITERSUBSTRAT | [2023/40] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INHIBITING A SUBSTRATE CURRENT IN AN IC SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'INHIBITION DE COURANT DE SUBSTRAT DANS UN SUBSTRAT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 23.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21714114.2 / EP4122012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0847089 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 45 *; | [A]US2005110111 (HORN WOLFGANG [AT]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0008] , [0016] , [0037] *; | [A]US2008023768 (ALBERKRACK JADE H [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0018] , [0019] , [0026] , [0027] *; | [A]WO2010095003 (FREESCALE SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, line 39 - page 2, line 3 ** page 4, line 19 - page 6, line 17 *; | [A]US2012176161 (PETRUZZI LUCA [AT]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] , [0025] , [0028] * | by applicant | DE602004006973T | DE4432301 | DE102005048239 | DE102020107479 |