EP4322125 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND PROCESSES OF PROVIDING FIRST RESPONDERS WITH LIVE CONTEXTUAL INFORMATION OF BUILDING DESTINATIONS FOR ENHANCED PUBLIC SAFETY OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NALUKURTHY, Rajeshbabu Charlotte, 28202 / US | 02 /
AGRAWAL, Sameer Charlotte, 28202 / US | 03 /
MACFARLANE, Andrew L. Charlotte, 28202 / US | 04 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Udayabharathi Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 23185928.1 | 17.07.2023 | [2024/07] | Priority number, date | US202217867146 | 18.07.2022 Original published format: US202217867146 | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322125 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/00, G08B27/00 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G08B25/004 (EP,CN);
G08B29/06 (US);
G08B25/009 (EP);
G08B25/01 (CN);
G08B25/08 (CN);
G08B27/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND PROZESSE ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ERSTEN RESPONDERN MIT LIVE-KONTEXTINFORMATIONEN VON GEBÄUDEZIELEN FÜR VERBESSERTE ÖFFENTLICHE SICHERHEITSOPERATIONEN | [2024/07] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND PROCESSES OF PROVIDING FIRST RESPONDERS WITH LIVE CONTEXTUAL INFORMATION OF BUILDING DESTINATIONS FOR ENHANCED PUBLIC SAFETY OPERATIONS | [2024/07] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET PROCÉDÉS DE FOURNITURE DE PREMIERS INTERVENANTS À DES INFORMATIONS CONTEXTUELLES EN DIRECT DE DESTINATIONS DE BÂTIMENTS POUR DES OPÉRATIONS DE SÉCURITÉ PUBLIQUE AMÉLIORÉES | [2024/07] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 31.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005060301 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 17 ** figure 1 *; | [I]US7085551 (BONNER THOMAS WAYNE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [I]WO2012117364 (SISVEL TECHNOLOGY SRL [IT], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 8, line 14 - page 16, line 22 * * figure 1 * |