EP4309984 - DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A MUSCLE-ELECTRIC HYBRID VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A MUSCLE-ELECTRIC HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Löwentaler Strasse 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lippenberger, Ingo 88263 Horgenzell / DE | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | ZF Friedrichshafen AG Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Löwentalerstraße 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 23186116.2 | 18.07.2023 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | DE202210207335 | 19.07.2022 Original published format: DE102022207335 | [2024/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4309984 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62K5/08 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
B62K5/08 (EP);
B62M6/60 (EP);
B62D9/002 (EP);
B62J9/12 (EP);
B62K21/00 (EP);
B62K3/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR EIN MUSKEL-ELEKTRO-HYBRIDFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES ANTRIEBSSYSTEMS FÜR EIN MUSKEL-ELEKTRO-HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | [2024/04] | English: | DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A MUSCLE-ELECTRIC HYBRID VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVE SYSTEM FOR A MUSCLE-ELECTRIC HYBRID VEHICLE | [2024/04] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR VÉHICULE HYBRIDE MUSCULAIRE-ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR VÉHICULE HYBRIDE MUSCULAIRE-ÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]AT12641U (ROHR FRIEDRICH [AT]) [X] 1,3,10,11,13,15 * paragraph [0010]; figure 1; claim 1 *[A] 2,4-9,12,14 | by applicant | DE19732468 |