Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117638137 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US202318198896 | 18.05.2023 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024072272 | Global Dossier | 29.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202263401287 | 26.08.2022 | US202318198896 | 18.05.2023 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4336696 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202263401287 | 26.08.2022 | US202318198896 | 18.05.2023 |