EP4311483 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MEASURING PULSE WAVE VELOCITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Ireland Manufacturing Unlimited Company 10 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 T380 / IE | [2024/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COATES, Paul J. Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 02 /
NAFEA, Bijan Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | 03 /
SHARMA, Sahil Santa Rosa, 95403 / US | [2024/05] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2024/05] | Application number, filing date | 23186428.1 | 19.07.2023 | [2024/05] | Priority number, date | US202263393682P | 29.07.2022 Original published format: US 202263393682 P | US202318210965 | 16.06.2023 Original published format: US202318210965 | [2024/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4311483 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4311483 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, A61B5/0215, A61B5/00, G16H20/40, // A61B18/02, A61B18/00, A61B18/14, A61B5/021, A61B5/20 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/6852 (EP);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B5/02007 (EP);
A61B5/02158 (EP);
G16H20/40 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00797 (EP);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP);
A61B2018/1861 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/05] | A61B5/02, A61B5/0215, A61B5/00, G16H20/40, // A61B18/02, A61B18/00, A61B18/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER PULSWELLENGESCHWINDIGKEIT | [2024/05] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MEASURING PULSE WAVE VELOCITY | [2024/05] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE MESURE DE LA VITESSE D'ONDE DE POULS | [2024/05] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 03.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2014188430 (CARDIOSONIC LTD [IL]); | [I]US2019223754 (GUNASEKARAN VENMATHI [US], et al); | [X]US2020069196 (HETTRICK DOUGLAS [US], et al); | [X]CN114052896 (SUZHOU RAINMED MEDICAL TECH CO LTD); |