EP4317831 - PHOTOVOLTAIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basic Societá A Responsabilitá Limitata Societá Benefit Contrada Monticello SNC 85042 Lagonegro (Potenza) / IT | [2024/19] |
Former [2024/06] | For all designated states Basic Societá A Responsabilitá Limitata Societá Benefit Via Umberto I, 24 85042 Lagonegro (Potenza) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IANNUZZI, Maurizio 42122 REGGIO NELL' EMILIA / IT | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Monelli, Alberto Bugnion S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23186612.0 | 20.07.2023 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | IT20220016701 | 04.08.2022 Original published format: IT202200016701 | [2024/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317831 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F24S25/11, F24S25/63, F24S25/16, H02S20/24, // F24S25/00, F24S80/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
F24S25/11 (EP);
H02S20/20 (US);
F24S25/16 (EP);
F24S25/63 (EP);
H02S20/10 (EP);
H02S20/24 (EP);
H02S40/12 (EP);
F24S2025/02 (EP);
F24S2080/012 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOTOVOLTAISCHES SYSTEM | [2024/06] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC SYSTEM | [2024/06] | French: | SYSTÈME PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2024/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102006042092 (K2 SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102009019548 (WILHELM OETTING KUNSTSTOFFVERF [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,5-9 *; | [Y]CN108377122 (GUANGDONG NAMKOO ELECTRIC POWER CO LTD) [Y] 4 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US10644644 (DICK ANDREW BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [I]IT202000005956 (CASIS MARIANELA [IT]) [I] 1,5,9,10 * figures 1-3,6,7 *; | [XYI]CN114826103 (GUANGDONG HUIFENG COMPREHENSIVE ENERGY CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,10 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 4 [I] 2,7,8 |