EP4285906 - AMINE-SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS EHMT2 INHIBITORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epizyme, Inc. 400 Technology Square, 4th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2024/07] |
Former [2023/49] | For all designated states Epizyme Inc 400 Technology Square, 4th Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPBELL, John Emmerson Cambridge, 02138 / US | 02 /
DUNCAN, Kenneth William Westwood, 02090 / US | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Russell, Tim, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23186749.0 | 19.12.2017 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | US201662436139P | 19.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662436139 P | US201762517840P | 09.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762517840 P | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4285906 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4285906 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D403/14, C07D413/12, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D491/04, C07D491/14, C07D498/04, A61P35/00, A61K31/519 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D491/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4985 (KR);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P7/06 (KR);
C07D239/48 (CN);
C07D401/04 (CN);
C07D401/14 (CN);
C07D403/04 (CN);
C07D403/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D405/14 (CN,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D417/12 (CN);
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D491/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D491/048 (CN);
C07D491/052 (CN);
C07D491/107 (US);
C07D498/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/49] | A61K31/519 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINSUBSTITUIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS EHMT2-INHIBITOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/49] | English: | AMINE-SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS EHMT2 INHIBITORS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2023/49] | French: | COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES SUBSTITUÉS PAR UNE AMINE UTILISÉS COMME INHIBITEURS DE L'EHMT2 ET LEURS MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2023/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17829454.2 / EP3555070 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8293746 (BOLD GUIDO [CH], et al); | [X]WO2014044025 (KBP BIOSCIENCES CO LTD [CN]); | [X]WO2014152768 (PORTOLA PHARM INC [US]); | [X]WO2016175264 (CARNA BIOSCIENCES INC [JP], et al); | [X]CN106083828 (UNIV ZHEJIANG); | by applicant | US4522811 | US5763263 |