EP4273314 - WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Dong Young 08576 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Wishney, Adam 04-08 098830 Singapore / SG | 03 /
Ryu, Doo Young 16703 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, In Ju 16904 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23186946.2 | 17.02.2016 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | KR20150026854 | 25.02.2015 Original published format: KR 20150026854 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273314 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/14, // D06F37/42, D06F39/12 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
D06F39/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F37/28 (CN,KR,US);
D06F34/20 (KR);
D06F34/28 (US);
D06F37/10 (CN,KR);
D06F37/18 (CN);
D06F37/42 (EP,KR);
E05D11/0081 (US);
D06F2103/40 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WASCHMASCHINE | [2023/45] | English: | WASHING MACHINE | [2023/45] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16755806.3 / EP3263757 | EP19166584.3 / EP3533919 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2261275 (SAN GIORGIO ELETTRODOMESTI) [X] 1,3-5 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 21; page 6, lines 1-11;; figure -; claim - * [A] 2,6-10; | [A]WO03029590 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [A] 1-10* page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 34;; figure -; claim - * |