EP4336038 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Neuson Linz GmbH Flughafenstraße 7 4063 Hörsching / AT | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farthofer, Dieter 4052 Ansfelden / AT | 02 /
Edlbauer, Georg 4212 Neumarkt / AT | 03 /
Koppensteiner, Georg 3931 Schweiggers / AT | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [2024/11] | Application number, filing date | 23186954.6 | 21.07.2023 | [2024/11] | Priority number, date | DE202210122738 | 07.09.2022 Original published format: DE102022122738 | [2024/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4336038 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4336038 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/14, E02F9/22 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
F02D41/1497 (EP);
E02F9/2246 (EP);
F02D2250/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER MOBILEN ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2024/11] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOBILE WORKING MACHINE | [2024/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL MOBILE | [2024/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1571339 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]); | [X]EP2130980 (VOLVO CONSTR EQUIP HOLDING SE [SE]); | [A]US2016047399 (KIM DONG MOK [KR], et al); | [A]US10208455 (FLEISCHMANN STEVE G [US], et al) |