EP4312132 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 26.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 2-9-32 Nakacho Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [2024/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURIHARA, Tatsuya Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 02 /
TACHIBANA, Takuya Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | [2024/05] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2024/05] | Application number, filing date | 23187009.8 | 21.07.2023 | [2024/05] | Priority number, date | JP20220122346 | 29.07.2022 Original published format: JP 2022122346 | [2024/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4312132 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G06F13/42 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
G06F13/4247 (EP);
G06F13/4282 (CN,KR,US);
G06F13/4068 (CN);
G06F13/4081 (EP,US);
G06F2213/0002 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2024/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT | [2024/05] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2024/05] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2024/05] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/35] | 23.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US2019235465 (LEE GEON-HO [KR]) |