EP4311192 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Tong Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 02 /
DING, Jiutao Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 23187102.1 | 21.07.2023 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | CN202210860604 | 21.07.2022 Original published format: CN202210860604 | [2024/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4311192 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4311192 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/00, H04L45/52, H04L45/741, H04L45/76, H04L45/64 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H04L45/34 (EP,CN);
H04L45/66 (EP,US);
H04L12/4604 (EP);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L12/4641 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/38 (EP);
H04L45/52 (EP);
H04L45/566 (EP);
H04L45/64 (EP,US);
H04L45/74 (CN);
H04L45/741 (EP);
H04L45/76 (EP);
H04L2012/4629 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/04] | H04L45/00, H04L45/52, H04L45/741, H04L45/76 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2024/04] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2024/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2024/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2020287826 (WANG YUBAO [CN]) [X] 8-10,15 * paragraph [0156] * * paragraph [0161] * * paragraph [0195] * * paragraph [0199] * * paragraph [0292] - paragraph [0299] * * paragraph [0302] * * paragraph [0327] - paragraph [0339] * * paragraph [0478] - paragraph [0518] * * paragraph [0645] - paragraph [0678] * [I] 11,14; | [XY]CN111786884 (ZTE CORP) [X] 8-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0121] - paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0132] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0147] * * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0156] * * paragraph [0161] * * paragraph [0166] - paragraph [0180] * * paragraph [0248] * [Y] 1-7,15; | [Y]US2022166860 (BRISSETTE PATRICE [CA], et al) [Y] 1-7,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0170] *; | [A] - Fady Khella, "Cisco Introduces Segment Routing v6 on Nexus 9000 GX Series Platforms - Cisco Blogs", (20200331), URL: https://blogs.cisco.com/datacenter/cisco-introduces-segment-routing-v6-on-nexus-9000-gx-series-platforms, (20231115), XP093101794 [A] 1-7,15 * the whole document * |