EP4238526 - CUTTING ASSEMBLY FOR A SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker European Operations Holdings LLC 2825 Airview Boulevard Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUSHEN, Patrick Graignamanagh / IE | 02 /
CURTIN, Damian Michael Tralee / IE | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 23187395.1 | 24.03.2017 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | US201662312675P | 24.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662312675 P | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4238526 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4238526 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, // A61B17/29, A61B17/00 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/32002 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00424 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00438 (US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | A61B90/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHNEIDANORDNUNG FÜR EIN CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT | [2023/36] | English: | CUTTING ASSEMBLY FOR A SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [2023/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE COUPE POUR INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17715277.4 / EP3432814 | EP21160482.2 / EP3851057 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202006006914U (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]); | [A]US2012209255 (BLOCHER MARTIN [DE], et al); | [A]US2013190759 (WAALER LUKE [US], et al); | [XI]US2014005700 (CASEY JAY A [US], et al); | [A]WO2014133664 (GYRUS ACMI INC DBA OLYMPUS SURGICAL TECHNOLOGIES AMERICA [US]); | [A]DE102013111194 (AESCULAP AG [DE]) | by applicant | US7237990 | WO2015024600 |