EP4254393 - DISPLAY WITH LIGHT-EMITTING DIODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Chin-Wei Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 02 /
LIN, Hung Sheng Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Shih-Chang Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23187572.5 | 17.10.2016 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | US201562263074P | 04.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562263074 P | US201615263803 | 13.09.2016 Original published format: US201615263803 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4254393 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4254393 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3233, H01L27/12 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3266 (KR,US);
G09G3/3275 (KR,US);
H01L27/1225 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/78651 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7869 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/0202 (US);
G09G2310/0256 (EP);
G09G2320/0295 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/043 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | G09G3/3233 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | ANZEIGE MIT LEUCHTDIODEN | [2023/40] | English: | DISPLAY WITH LIGHT-EMITTING DIODES | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16790797.1 / EP3365887 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010220117 (KIMURA HAJIME [JP]); | [Y]EP2626851 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN104064149 (SHENZHEN CHINA STAR OPTOELECT); | [A]CN104282266 (APPLE INC); | [Y]CN104332485 (APPLE INC); | [Y]US2015049126 (JUNG DONG-HUN [KR]); | [A]US2015109279 (GUPTA VASUDHA [US], et al); | [A]US2015213757 (TAKAHAMA KENGO [JP], et al); | [A]US2015243718 (KWON HOIYONG [KR], et al); | [A]US2015248856 (KISHI NORITAKA [JP], et al); | [P]US2016063921 (TSAI TSUNG-TING [TW], et al); | [P]US2016087022 (TSAI TSUNG-TING [TW], et al); | US2017110052 [ ] (KUO PING SHENG [CN]) |