EP4249494 - USE OF A RADICAL GENERATING CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OXIDATION REACTION PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acenet Inc. 9F, Palazzo Girasole 2-9-2 Higashi-shimbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAMORI, Kiyoto Tokyo, 105-0021 / JP | 02 /
SHIBATA, Takekatsu Tokyo, 105-0021 / JP | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 23187610.3 | 16.12.2016 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | JP20150248067 | 18.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015248067 | JP20150248068 | 18.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015248068 | JP20150248069 | 18.12.2015 Original published format: JP 2015248069 | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4249494 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4249494 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/02, C07C51/235, C07C63/06, C07D219/06, C07F15/06, C07B61/00, C07F9/53 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
B01J31/0239 (EP,US);
A61K31/14 (EP,US);
A61K33/20 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
B01J31/0204 (US);
B01J31/0224 (EP,US);
B01J31/0271 (US);
C07B61/02 (US);
C07C29/48 (US);
C07C51/235 (EP,US);
C07C63/06 (EP,US);
C07D219/06 (EP,US);
C07F15/06 (EP,US);
C07F15/065 (US);
B01J2231/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/39] | C07F9/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2023/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES RADIKALBILDENDEN KATALYSATORS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OXIDATIONSREAKTIONSPRODUKTS | [2023/39] | English: | USE OF A RADICAL GENERATING CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING OXIDATION REACTION PRODUCT | [2023/39] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN CATALYSEUR GÉNÉRATEUR DE RADICAUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT DE RÉACTION D'OXYDATION | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16875771.4 / EP3391965 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005305109 (MATSUMOTO YUKIE); | [A]JP2008264615 (SOMAR CORP); | by applicant | JP2009100850 | JP5213142B | JP2014091063 |