EP4252718 - EXPANSION MEMBERS FOR IMPLANTABLE DEVICES AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IRWIN, Craig W. Newark, 19711 / US | 02 /
SILVERMAN, James D. Newark, 19711 / US | 03 /
SKELTON, Tyson J. Newark, 19711 / US | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23187718.4 | 30.04.2019 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | US201862665695P | 02.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665695 P | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4252718 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4252718 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/915, A61F2/07 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP);
A61F2/915 (US);
A61F2/82 (US);
A61F2/89 (US);
A61F2002/91516 (EP);
A61F2250/0063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | A61F2/915 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EXPANSIONSELEMENTE FÜR IMPLANTIERBARE VORRICHTUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE SYSTEME | [2023/40] | English: | EXPANSION MEMBERS FOR IMPLANTABLE DEVICES AND ASSOCIATED SYSTEMS | [2023/40] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS D'EXPANSION POUR DISPOSITIFS IMPLANTABLES ET SYSTÈMES | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.10.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19727539.9 / EP3787553 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0106952 (MED INST INC [US], et al); | [X]US2011087318 (DAUGHERTY JOHN R [US], et al); | [XI]US2014142684 (ZUKOWSKI STANISLAW L [US]) |