EP4258673 - VIDEO TRANSMISSION METHOD, VIDEO RECEPTION METHOD, VIDEO TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND VIDEO RECEPTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 22-6, Moto-machi Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-0057 / JP | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMA, Tadamasa Osaka / JP | 02 /
NISHI, Takahiro Osaka / JP | 03 /
IGUCHI, Noritaka Osaka / JP | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23188217.6 | 02.09.2016 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | US201562238155P | 07.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562238155 P | JP20160101958 | 20.05.2016 Original published format: JP 2016101958 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4258673 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4258673 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2343, H04N21/431, H04N21/4402, H04N21/485, H04N21/434, H04N21/234, H04N21/236, H04N19/89 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
H04N19/89 (EP,US);
H04N21/234309 (CN);
H04N21/2343 (EP,US);
G06T5/90 (US);
H04N19/30 (US);
H04N21/23418 (EP,US);
H04N21/234363 (CN);
H04N21/23614 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/4402 (EP,US);
H04N21/440218 (CN);
H04N21/440263 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | H04N19/89 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | VIDEOÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, VIDEOEMPFANGSVERFAHREN, VIDEOÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VIDEOEMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/41] | English: | VIDEO TRANSMISSION METHOD, VIDEO RECEPTION METHOD, VIDEO TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND VIDEO RECEPTION DEVICE | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION VIDÉO, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE VIDÉO, DISPOSITIF D'ÉMISSION VIDÉO ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION DE VIDÉO | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 03.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16853230.7 / EP3361736 | EP20200274.7 / EP3783901 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013287313 (MARCHESSOUX CEDRIC FABRICE [FR], et al); | [A]US2014210847 (KNIBBELER CHARLES LEONARDUS CORNELIUS MARIA [NL], et al); | [A]WO2014116715 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US]); | [A]WO2014178286 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [P]EP2993886 (SONY CORP [JP]) |