EP4292529 - METHOD FOR MODE SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DexCom, Inc. 6340 Sequence Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWMAN, Leif, N. San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 02 /
BHAVARAJU, Naresh, C. San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 03 /
BLOOM, Michael, A. San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 04 /
CARLTON, Alexandra, Lynn San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 05 /
KOEHLER, Katherine, Yerre San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 06 /
HAMPAPURAM, Hari San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 07 /
JEPSON, Lauren, Hruby San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 08 /
HUGHES, Jonathan San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 09 /
KAMATH, Apurv, Ullas San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 10 /
DAVIS, Anna Leigh San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 11 /
SIMPSON, Peter, C. San Diego, California, 92121 / US | 12 /
VANSLYKE, Stephen, J. San Diego, California, 92121 / US | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 23188218.4 | 22.09.2015 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US201462053733P | 22.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462053733 P | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4292529 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4292529 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (US);
A61B5/14503 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (US);
A61B5/1455 (US);
A61B5/1486 (US);
A61B5/1495 (EP,US);
A61B5/7221 (US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
A61B5/7282 (US);
A61B5/742 (EP,US);
A61B5/7435 (EP,US);
A61B5/746 (EP,US);
A61B5/7475 (EP,US);
A61M5/1723 (US);
G16H40/40 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0223 (US);
A61B2560/0487 (EP,US);
A61B5/0004 (EP,US);
A61B5/6898 (EP,US);
A61B5/72 (EP,US);
A61M2230/005 (US);
A61M2230/201 (US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODUSUMSCHALTUNG | [2023/51] | English: | METHOD FOR MODE SWITCHING | [2023/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION DE MODE | [2023/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15778109.7 / EP3197356 | EP20213880.6 / EP3892197 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005027180 (GOODE PAUL V [US], et al); | [XYI]US2010057041 (HAYTER GARY [US]); | [X]US2012078071 (BOHM SEBASTIAN [US], et al); | [XI]US2012125075 (GOTTLIEB REBECCA K [US], et al); | [Y]US2012271557 (SEKIMOTO SHINJIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2014000338 (LUO YING [US], et al); | [A]US2014012510 (MENSINGER MICHAEL ROBERT [US], et al) | by applicant | US9065 | US6001067 | US6424847 | US6477395 | US6484046 | US6512939 | US6565509 | US6579690 | US2005027463 | US2005245799 | US2006020187 | US2007027385 | US2008119703 | US7460898 | US7497827 | US2009192366 | US7778680 | US2010261987 | US7920906 | US8010174 | US8290559 | US2012265035 | US8478377 | US2014182350 | US2014184422 | US8828201 | WO2014158327 | US19630621584 | US19650620090 | US19510619781 | US20060543396 | US20070675063 | US20070691426 |