EP4243590 - ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOH, Seonghee 04194 Seoul / KR | 02 /
LIM, YoungNam 06558 Seoul / KR | 03 /
LEE, SangHo 10861 Paju-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
RYU, DaeWon 10920 Paju-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 23188374.5 | 30.09.2016 | [2023/37] | Priority number, date | KR20160081206 | 28.06.2016 Original published format: KR 20160081206 | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4243590 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4243590 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10K50/844, H10K50/852, H10K50/858, H10K59/10, H10K59/80 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
H10K59/876 (EP,KR);
H10K50/19 (KR);
H10K50/852 (US);
G09G3/3233 (KR);
H10K50/11 (US);
H10K50/13 (KR);
H10K50/81 (US);
H10K50/82 (US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K50/858 (US);
H10K59/12 (EP,KR,US);
H10K59/1213 (KR);
H10K59/1216 (KR);
H10K59/123 (KR);
H10K59/80515 (KR);
H10K59/80517 (KR);
H10K59/80518 (KR);
H10K59/80521 (KR);
H10K59/80524 (KR);
H10K59/872 (KR);
H10K59/873 (EP,KR);
H10K59/879 (EP,KR);
H10K77/10 (KR);
H10K2102/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/37] | H10K50/858 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/37] | English: | ORGANIC LIGHT EMITTING DISPLAY DEVICE | [2023/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16191755.4 / EP3264483 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006250084 (COK RONALD S [US], et al); | [A]US2010243999 (ISHIKAWA HIRAKU [JP]); | [A]US2011100458 (KANG JAE-WOOK [KR], et al); | [A]US2011309739 (SONG HYUNG-JUN [KR], et al); | [XAI]WO2014041743 (SONY CORP [JP]) |