EP4321920 - NAVIGATION IN GPS DENIED ENVIRONMENTS THROUGH ENHANCED NIGHTVISION WITH TRANSPARENT OPTICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L3Harris Technologies, Inc. 1025 West NASA Blvd. Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMSAY, Eric Melbourne, 32919 / US | 02 /
LEBEAU, James A. Melbourne, 32919 / US | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/07] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 23188634.2 | 31.07.2023 | [2024/07] | Priority number, date | US202217878817 | 01.08.2022 Original published format: US202217878817 | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321920 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/12, F41G1/32, // G02B13/16, G01C21/00 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G02B23/12 (EP);
G01C21/3848 (US);
G01C21/005 (EP);
G01C21/025 (EP);
G01C21/1656 (EP);
G01C3/04 (EP);
G02B27/0101 (US);
G06T7/70 (US);
G02B13/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAVIGATION IN GPS-VERWEIGERTEN UMGEBUNGEN DURCH ERWEITERTE NACHTSICHT MIT TRANSPARENTER OPTISCHER VORRICHTUNG | [2024/07] | English: | NAVIGATION IN GPS DENIED ENVIRONMENTS THROUGH ENHANCED NIGHTVISION WITH TRANSPARENT OPTICAL DEVICE | [2024/07] | French: | NAVIGATION DANS DES ENVIRONNEMENTS INDEPENDANTS DU GPS PAR VISION NOCTURNE AMELIOREE AVEC DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE TRANSPARENT | [2024/07] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 11.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2020400944 (BURNSED JON [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7 * figures 2A-3,8 * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0084] * [Y] 2,5,9 [I] 3,8,10; | [Y]US2021293546 (ZHANG JI [US], et al) [Y] 9* paragraphs [0011] , [0270] *; | [Y] - MELZER JAMES E ET AL, "Location and head orientation tracking in GPS-denied environments", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE ISSN 0277-786X VOLUME 10524], SPIE, US, (20180502), vol. 10642, doi:10.1117/12.2304013, ISBN 978-1-5106-1533-5, pages 106420P - 106420P, XP060107428 [Y] 2,5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2304013 |