EP4332943 - AIRCRAFT SYSTEMS AND METHODS WITH AUTOMATED RUNWAY CONDITION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 06.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Zuowei Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Peter Lawrence LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House, Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23188901.5 | 01.08.2023 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | US202217821027 | 19.08.2022 Original published format: US202217821027 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332943 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/02, G08G5/06 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G08G5/025 (EP,US);
G08G5/0013 (US);
G08G5/0021 (EP,US);
G08G5/003 (US);
G08G5/0047 (US);
G08G5/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/41] |
Former [2024/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN MIT AUTOMATISIERTEN LANDEBAHNZUSTANDSINFORMATIONEN | [2024/10] | English: | AIRCRAFT SYSTEMS AND METHODS WITH AUTOMATED RUNWAY CONDITION INFORMATION | [2024/10] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'AÉRONEF AVEC INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE PISTE AUTOMATISÉES | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/41] | 02.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2657923 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0011] - [0014] - [0028] - [0032] - [0 41] , [0055] , [0059] *; | [YA]US2018182250 (BONNET ANTOINE-ADRIEN [FR], et al) [Y] 2-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0021] - [0028] - [0069] , [0070] , [0096] , [0116] * [A] 1,13-15; | [YDA]US2021221531 (KANAGARAJAN SIVAKUMAR [IN], et al) [YD] 14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] - [0008] - [0027] - [0029] - [0034] - [0041] - [0055] , [0066] , [0071] , [0072] *[A] 1-13; | [XY]US2022189324 (SINGH JAIBIR [IN]) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0013] , [0049] , [0051] , [0054] , [0059] , [0064] - [0071] * [Y] 2-12,14,15 | by applicant | US2021221531 |