EP4285912 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING ATAXIN 3 EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ionis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | For all designated states Academisch Ziekenhuis Leiden (h.o.d.n. LUMC) Albinusdreef 2 2333 ZA Leiden / NL | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGO, Frank Carlsbad, 92010 / US | 02 /
PRAKASH, Thazha P. Carlsbad, 92010 / US | 03 /
VAN ROON-MOM, Wilhemina Maria, Clasina 1944 Beverwijk / NL | 04 /
TOONEN, Lodewijk Julius, Anton 2235CD Valkenburg / NL | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23188922.1 | 23.09.2016 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | US201562232956P | 25.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562232956 P | US201662307279P | 11.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662307279 P | US201662315521P | 30.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662315521 P | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4285912 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4285912 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C12N9/48, A61K31/712 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K31/712 (EP,US);
C12N9/485 (EP,US);
C12Y304/19012 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/49] | A61K31/712 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION VON ATAXIN 3-EXPRESSION | [2023/49] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING ATAXIN 3 EXPRESSION | [2023/49] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE MODULATION DE L'EXPRESSION DE L'ATAXINE 3 | [2023/49] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16849742.8 / EP3353303 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013138353 (SHIRE HUMAN GENETIC THERAPIES [US]); | [A]US8901095 (COREY DAVID R [US], et al); | [A]WO2015053624 (ACADEMISCH ZIEKENHUIS LEIDEN [NL]); | by applicant | US3687808 | US4845205 | US5034506 | US5130302 | US5134066 | US5166315 | US5175273 | US5185444 | US5367066 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5457187 | US5457191 | US5459255 | US5484908 | US5502177 | US5525711 | US5552540 | US5587469 | US5587470 | US5594121 | US5596091 | US5614617 | US5645985 | US5681941 | US5698685 | US5750692 | US5763588 | US5808027 | US5811534 | US5830653 | US5859221 | WO9914226 | US5948903 | US6005087 | US6005096 | US6166199 | US6268490 | US6525191 | US6531584 | US2003158403 | US2003175906 | US6670461 | US6770748 | US6794499 | WO2004106356 | US7034133 | US7053207 | WO2007134181 | US2008039618 | US7399845 | WO2008101157 | US7427672 | US7547684 | US7569686 | US7572582 | US7666854 | US7696345 | US7741457 | US7750131 | US7875733 | US7939677 | US8022193 | US8030467 | US8034909 | WO2011133876 | US8080644 | US8088746 | US8088904 | US8124745 | US8153365 | US8268980 | US8278283 | US8278426 | US8440803 | US8501805 | US2013203836 | US8530640 | US8546556 | USRE44779E | US8796437 | WO2014179620 | US9005906 | US9012421 | US2015191727 | WO2015106128 |