EP4317805 - COOKING APPLIANCE COMPRISING AN OPENABLE PANEL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Moon Ho Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
Jang, Seung Tae Seoul 08592 / KR | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23189197.9 | 02.08.2023 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | KR20220096306 | 02.08.2022 Original published format: KR 20220096306 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317805 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/32, F24C7/08 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
F24C15/327 (EP,KR);
F24C7/085 (KR);
A47J27/04 (CN);
F24C15/08 (KR,US);
A47J36/00 (CN);
A47J37/0623 (CN);
A47J37/0664 (CN);
E05D15/581 (KR);
F16F15/04 (KR);
F24C15/003 (KR);
F24C15/06 (US);
F24C7/006 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/37] |
Former [2024/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOCHGERÄT MIT EINER ZU ÖFFNENDEN PLATTENEINHEIT | [2024/06] | English: | COOKING APPLIANCE COMPRISING AN OPENABLE PANEL UNIT | [2024/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE CUISSON COMPRENANT UN PANNEAU OUVRABLE | [2024/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 06.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006072903 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2009046811 (MIELE & CIE [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* figure - *; | [Y]WO2015086247 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7 * figures 3,4 *; | [XYI]EP3594573 (TEKA PORTUGAL S A [PT]) [X] 1-6,8-11,14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026]; figures 2-5,7,8,10 * [Y] 7 [I] 12,13,15 | by applicant | US2010206414 | EP3080517 | EP3551942 | KR20220096306 |