Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024044505 | Global Dossier | 08.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20220096306 | 02.08.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240018268 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20220096306 | 02.08.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117481503 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20220096306 | 02.08.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2023206223 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20220096306 | 02.08.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4317805 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20220096306 | 02.08.2022 |