EP4257451 - WHEELED CONTAINER HANDLE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keter Home and Garden Products Ltd. 1 Sapir Street, 14th Floor Industrial Zone 4685205 Herzliya / IL | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNNER, Yaron 3657900 Kibbutz Gvat / IL | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23189292.8 | 08.12.2016 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | US201562265510P | 10.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562265510 P | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4257451 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4257451 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62B5/04, B62B1/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
B62B5/049 (EP);
B62B1/008 (EP,US);
B62B1/16 (US);
B62B5/067 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | B62B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2023/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GRIFFANORDNUNG FÜR ROLLBEHÄLTER | [2023/41] | English: | WHEELED CONTAINER HANDLE ASSEMBLY | [2023/41] | French: | ENSEMBLE POIGNÉE DE CONTENEUR À ROUES | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 05.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16825900.0 / EP3386836 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN2198167Y (YINZHU VEHICLE FACTORY QINGDAO [CN]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002070517 (RAMSEY WILLIAM AARON [US]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]US2009266833 (SAVAGE STEPHEN A [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |