EP4322101 - VIDEO RECONSTRUCTION FROM VIDEOS WITH ULTRA-LOW FRAME-PER-SECOND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meta Platforms, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIANG, Xiaoyu Menlo Park, 94025 / US | 02 /
COTOROS, Ingrid Anda Menlo Park, 94025 / US | 03 /
RANJAN, Rakesh Menlo Park, 94025 / US | 04 /
CHANDRA, Vikas Menlo Park, 94025 / US | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/07] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 23189323.1 | 02.08.2023 | [2024/07] | Priority number, date | US202217887034 | 12.08.2022 Original published format: US202217887034 | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4322101 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4322101 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/4007 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G06T3/4007 (EP);
H04N23/951 (CN);
G06T7/38 (US);
G06T7/33 (US);
G06V10/806 (US);
H04N7/0127 (CN);
G06T2207/10016 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/39] |
Former [2024/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOREKONSTRUKTION AUS VIDEOS MIT ULTRANIEDRIGEM BILD PRO SEKUNDEN | [2024/07] | English: | VIDEO RECONSTRUCTION FROM VIDEOS WITH ULTRA-LOW FRAME-PER-SECOND | [2024/07] | French: | RECONSTRUCTION VIDÉO À PARTIR DE VIDÉOS AVEC UNE TRAME ULTRA-FAIBLE PAR SECONDE | [2024/07] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2022210402 (LI ZEQIANG [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075] *; | [A] - PARIHAR ANIL SINGH ET AL, "A comprehensive survey on video frame interpolation techniques", VISUAL COMPUTER, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, vol. 38, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00371-020-02016-Y, ISSN 0178-2789, (20210104), pages 295 - 319, (20210104), XP037687903 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00371-020-02016-y |