EP4328065 - COVER-EQUIPPED ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alps Alpine Co., Ltd. 1-7, Yukigaya-otsukamachi Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Naoto Iwaki, Fukushima / JP | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23189722.4 | 04.08.2023 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | JP20220135028 | 26.08.2022 Original published format: JP 2022135028 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4328065 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/22, B60K35/50, B60R11/02, G02F1/1333, H05K5/00, H05K5/02, H05K5/03 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B60K35/22 (EP);
H05K5/0217 (CN);
H05K5/03 (CN,US);
B60K35/50 (EP);
B60R11/0229 (EP);
H05K5/0018 (CN);
H05K5/0221 (US);
H05K5/0234 (US);
B60K2360/688 (EP);
B60K2360/691 (EP);
B60K2360/771 (EP,US);
B60K2360/84 (EP);
B60K35/00 (US);
B60K35/60 (US);
B60R2011/0071 (EP);
G02F1/133308 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT EINER ABDECKUNG AUSGESTATTETE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/09] | English: | COVER-EQUIPPED ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2024/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ÉQUIPÉ D'UN COUVERCLE | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 23.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3929768 (LOEWE OPTA GMBH [DE]); | [XA]WO2007046789 (DUEL SYSTEMS [US], et al); | [XA]US2021243909 (MORITA SHINJI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH08130382 |