EP4249282 - A SECURITY SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | New entry: Receipt of request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House Jays Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHILLON, Baljeet Hampshire, RH22 4BS / GB | 02 /
SUGDON, Matthew Hampshire, RH22 4BS / GB | 03 /
BOBAT, Shireen Hampshire, RG22 4BS / GB | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 23190244.6 | 01.03.2019 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | GB20180003449 | 02.03.2018 Original published format: GB 201803449 | GB20180010627 | 28.06.2018 Original published format: GB 201810627 | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4249282 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4249282 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/24, B42D25/36, B42D25/455, B42D25/46 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
B42D25/24 (EP,GB,US);
B42D13/00 (GB,US);
B42D25/36 (EP,US);
B42D25/455 (EP,US);
B42D25/46 (EP,US);
B42D25/23 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/39] | B42D25/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/31] |
Former [2023/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSFOLIE | [2023/39] | English: | A SECURITY SHEET | [2023/39] | French: | FEUILLE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 19.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19710104.1 / EP3758948 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.10.2024 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102015102304 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0048]; figures 1-6 *[A] 9 | by applicant | EP1592565 | EP1502765 | WO2017060684 | WO2017060688 |