EP4247067 - NETWORK ACCESS FROM AIRBORNE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDRA, Ranveer Washington / US | 02 /
HORVITZ, Eric Washington / US | 03 /
KAPOOR, Ashish Washington / US | 04 /
AHMAD, Talal Washington / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23190245.3 | 20.02.2019 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | US201815906909 | 27.02.2018 Original published format: US201815906909 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4247067 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4247067 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, // H04W52/02 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H04B7/18504 (EP,US);
H04B7/18506 (EP,US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04B7/155 (US);
H04W52/0206 (EP,US);
H04B7/18508 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | NETZWERKZUGANG VON EINEM LUFTFAHRZEUG AUS | [2023/38] | English: | NETWORK ACCESS FROM AIRBORNE VEHICLE | [2023/38] | French: | ACCÈS RÉSEAU DEPUIS UN VÉHICULE AÉRIEN | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19709289.3 / EP3759838 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2015236779 (JALALI AHMAD [US]) [X] 1,11-13 * figures 6, 7B * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0080] * [A] 2-9 [I] 10; | [A]US2015236778 (JALALI AHMAD [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 9 ** paragraph [0100] *; | [A]US2016046387 (FROLOV SERGEY V [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 7, 8,18 * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0098] *; | [A]EP3196670 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] *; | [A]US2017257779 (ZERICK JULIETTE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0038] * |