EP4246581 - PHOTODETECTORS, PREPARATION METHODS FOR PHOTODETECTORS, PHOTODETECTOR ARRAYS, AND PHOTODETECTION TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Adaps Photonics Technology Co., Ltd. 12th Floor, Building 3 Nanshan Zhiyuan Chongwen Park No. 3370 Liuxian Avenue Taoyuan Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518055 / CN | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zang, Kai Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518055 / CN | 02 /
Li, Shuang Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518055 / CN | 03 /
Jia, Jieyang Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518055 / CN | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23190530.8 | 12.09.2019 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | CN201811339767 | 12.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811339767 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4246581 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4246581 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0232, H01L31/107, G01S7/481, H01L27/146 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
H01L31/02327 (EP);
H01L31/09 (CN);
H01L31/02027 (US);
H01L27/1446 (EP);
H01L27/14629 (EP);
H01L31/0216 (CN,US);
H01L31/0352 (CN,US);
H01L31/107 (EP,US);
H01L31/1075 (EP);
G01S7/4816 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | H01L27/146 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | PHOTODETEKTOREN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR PHOTODETEKTOREN, PHOTODETEKTORANORDNUNGEN UND PHOTODETEKTORANSCHLÜSSE | [2023/38] | English: | PHOTODETECTORS, PREPARATION METHODS FOR PHOTODETECTORS, PHOTODETECTOR ARRAYS, AND PHOTODETECTION TERMINALS | [2023/38] | French: | PHOTODÉTECTEURS, PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE PHOTODÉTECTEURS, RÉSEAUX DE PHOTODÉTECTEURS ET TERMINAUX DE PHOTODÉTECTION | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19883758.5 / EP3882981 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015372040 (PRALLE MARTIN U [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 6 *; | [Y]US2018090536 (MANDAI SHINGO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] , [0 54] , [0 66] - [0067]; figure 4A *; | [A] - GHIONI M ET AL, "Resonant-Cavity-Enhanced Single-Photon Avalanche Diodes on Reflecting Silicon Substrates", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE, USA, (20080315), vol. 20, no. 6, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 413 - 415, XP011204653 [A] 1-15 * figure 3 * |