Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12092841 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2024 | B2 | US2023056609 | 23.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816064114 | 20.06.2018 | US201662439518 | 28.12.2016 | US202217971565 | 22.10.2022 | WO2017IB57706 | 06.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11531209 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | B2 | US2021208415 | 08.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662439518 | 28.12.2016 | US201716064114 | 06.12.2017 | WO2017IB57706 | 06.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102269547B | Global Dossier | 25.06.2021 | B1 | KR20190092459 | 07.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662439518 | 28.12.2016 | WO2017IB57706 | 06.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3842853 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2024 | C0 | EP3842853 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2024 | B1 | EP3842853 | 30.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662439518 | 28.12.2016 | WO2017IB57706 | 06.12.2017 | EP17887407 | 06.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3563193 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2021 | B1 | EP3563193 | 06.11.2019 | A4 | EP3563193 | 06.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662439518 | 28.12.2016 | WO2017IB57706 | 06.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114051092B | Global Dossier | 26.07.2024 | B | CN114051092 | 15.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662439518 | 28.12.2016 | WO2017IB57706 | 06.12.2017 | CN202111285878 | 06.12.2017 | CN201780081406 | 06.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110140078B | Global Dossier | 19.11.2021 | B | CN110140078 | 16.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662439518 | 28.12.2016 | WO2017IB57706 | 06.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4246993 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2024 | A3 | EP4246993 | 20.09.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662439518 | 28.12.2016 | EP21157082 | 06.12.2017 | WO2017IB57706 | 06.12.2017 | EP17887407 | 06.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018122650 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662439518 | 28.12.2016 | Type | Earlier application | EP3563193 | EP3842853 |